BUTTERFLIES BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of services related to bereavement These activities include Bereavement Counselling and Support Services. The alleviation of loneliness and isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- West Sussex
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Lamont | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Goold-Davies | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Judith Hopkins | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Tracey Eldridge | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.29k | £37.10k | £36.27k | £9.64k | £21.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.93k | £22.80k | £27.30k | £25.19k | £29.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.39k | £1.63k | N/A | £9.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF THE PUBLIC PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING FREE BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Pirelli Way
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO50 5GE
- Phone:
- 02381550066
- Email:
- info@bflies.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window