LONGFORD PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTE LONGFORD PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY PHASES 1-4 OF THE LONGFORD PARK DEVELOPMENT IN BANBURY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION. Operate community events and community centre (eventually)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Ann Foster | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Dewberry | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebrina Louise O'Rourke | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Erin Mary Houston | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.13k | £13.27k | £47.64k | £50.29k | £57.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.57k | £19.01k | £46.57k | £55.18k | £50.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.03k | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2023 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2023 | 409 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2023 | 409 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2023 | 774 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2023 | 774 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (1) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONGFORD PARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY PHASES 1-4 OF THE LONGFORD PARK DEVELOPMENT IN BANBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. IN FURTHERNCE OF THESE OBJECTS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHAL, HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR CO OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (2) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Longford Park Community Centre
Hobby Road
Bodicote
Banbury
Oxfordshire
OX15 4GJ
- Phone:
- 01295227001
- Email:
- enquiries@lpca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window