BIG LEAF FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Big Leaf Foundation aims to provide a nurturing programme of activities, projects and events, that focus on combating social isolation for displaced young people in Surrey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,172 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
31 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICKI MARIA LOUISE ASHRAF FELGATE | Chair | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sophia Kerenhappuch Parkes | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Heather Bagwell | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Matthew Early | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.97k | £93.07k | £255.64k | £226.26k | £324.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.44k | £92.71k | £191.90k | £208.02k | £289.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £11.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.69k | N/A | N/A | £29.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2018 as amended on 20 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG DISPLACED YOUNG PEOPLE IN SURREY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION BY PROVIDING: A) EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND VOCATIONAL AND SOCIAL SKILLS; B) OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL, SPORTS, ARTS AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE WIDER COMMUNITY THAT BUILD CONFIDENCE AND SELF ESTEEM AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE DISPLACED YOUNG PEOPLE ARE DEFINED AS: • UNACCOMPANIED ASYLUM SEEKING CHILDREN (UASC) (UNDER 18) LIVING IN SURREY EITHER IN FOSTER CARE OR SUPPORTED HOUSING (E.G., YOUTH HOSTELS) INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARRIVED AS UASC BUT HAVE SINCE BEEN GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS. A UASC IS DEFINED BY THE GOVERNMENT AS “AN INDIVIDUAL WHO IS UNDER 18, HAS ARRIVED IN THE UK WITHOUT A RESPONSIBLE ADULT, IS NOT BEING CARED FOR BY AN ADULT WHO BY LAW OR CUSTOM HAS RESPONSIBILITY TO DO SO, IS SEPARATED FROM BOTH PARENTS AND HAS APPLIED FOR ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN HIS/HER OWN RIGHT." • DISPLACED YOUNG PEOPLE (UP TO 21 YEARS) IN THE UK UNDER THE VPRS (VULNERABLE PERSON RESETTLEMENT SCHEME). THE GOVERNMENT DEFINES ‘DISPLACED YOUNG PERSONS UNDER VPRS’ AS "AT RISK CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES FROM THE MIDDLE EAST AND NORTH AFRICA RESETTLED TO THE UK BY THE GOVERNMENT." • UASC/REFUGEE CARE LEAVERS (18 – 25 YEARS) UNDER THE CARE OF SURREY SOCIAL SERVICE. ‘A CARE LEAVER’ IS DEFINED AS “A YOUNG PERSON OVER THE AGE OF 16 WHO HAS BEEN IN CARE OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND/OR HEALTH & SOCIAL CARE TRUST FOR AT LEAST 13 WEEKS SINCE THE AGE OF 14." 2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE AND RELIGION; (B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND (C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 1655
GUILDFORD
GU1 9JS
- Phone:
- 07464386874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window