Financial history JUSTICE RISING UK

Charity number: 1183447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £49.93k £54.08k £47.45k £12.67k £12.10k
Total expenditure £35.89k £53.47k £32.22k £20.74k £7.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.35k N/A N/A N/A N/A