MESSINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The village hall is for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Messingham without distinction of political, religious or other opinions including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the condtions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £2,380 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 23 August 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Thomspon | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Marie Fowler | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH MARY GELDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.00k | £102.04k | £62.56k | £36.98k | £34.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.76k | £90.08k | £55.24k | £35.70k | £28.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £141.70k | £43.50k | £23.15k | N/A | £2.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2019
(These accounts |
15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 21 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2017 as amended on 20 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INGABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MESSINGHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMRPOVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MESSINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Messingham Village Hall
Wendover Road
Messingham
Scunthorpe
DN17 3SN
- Phone:
- 01724 760000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window