MASJID-UL-AQSA AND ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Charity is to provide religious facilities for the followers of the Islamic faith, to establish, manage and maintain Masjid-ul-Aqsa and Islamic Centre in accordance with Islamic principles and values and to offer provision for Islamic teachings and wider community facilities. The Charity aims to provide public prayer facilities 5 times a day 365 days a year,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IQBAL AHMED OBE | Chair | 10 June 2018 |
|
|||||
AKHLAQUL AMBIA | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SOMUJ MIAH | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ali Akbor | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|||||
BILAL AHMED | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.76k | £68.57k | £211.23k | £103.17k | £83.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.93k | £28.44k | £28.57k | £30.53k | £41.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2024 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2024 | 325 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2021 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2021 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND / OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HAMPTON STREET
OLDHAM
OL8 1RF
- Phone:
- 07803198520
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window