CWF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Planting trees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2018: CIO registration
- CHURCHILL WOODLAND FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES CHURCHILL | Chair | 11 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SVETLANA CHURCHILL | Trustee | 11 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA VICTORIA MITCHELL-HUDSON | Trustee | 11 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57k | £236 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO CONSERVE, RESTORE AND RE-ESTABLISH TREES, IN PARTICULAR BROAD-LEAVED TREES, PLANTS AND ALL FORMS OF WILD LIFE IN THE UK AND THEREBY TO SECURE AND ENHANCE THE ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 HEMINGFORD ROAD
LONDON
N1 0JU
- Phone:
- 07917488026
- Email:
- charlie@thecwf.co.uk
- Website:
-
thecwf.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window