ABBEY PEOPLE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abbey People works with the Statutory and Voluntary sector, along with local residents, to seek to bring improvements to the Abbey Ward area of Cambridge. We do this through running events, groups, networking, providing training and information, fundraising, partnering with other charities and groups and responding as appropriate to the input of local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 November 2018: CIO registration
- 07 November 2022: Funds received from 1072923 THE EAST BARNWELL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faye McDonough | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Irvine | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Hye | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kovacs | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Stafford | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Pilgrim Pilgrim | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER GOTHAM | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Secker | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Catherine Bromwich | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.90k | £241.93k | £205.40k | £319.33k | £283.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.10k | £112.16k | £190.28k | £224.75k | £267.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.00k | £70.16k | £84.96k | £27.71k | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Nov 2018 as amended on 10 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ABBEY WARD IN CAMBRIDGE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hub
15 Barnwell Road
Cambridge
CB5 8RG
- Phone:
- 01223211945
- Email:
- Admin@abbeypeople.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window