EVOLVE HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evolve Housing Association is a non-profit social enterprise, we aim to use profits and assets for the needs of the public at large. We are a charity incorporated organisation. We support vulnerable individuals, based on their needs and do not categorise them to their requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 29 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Khurshid Ahmed | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
AMREEN ASLAM | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBINA DIN | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.64k | £140.34k | £210.64k | £375.68k | £470.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.70k | £119.12k | £220.39k | £363.42k | £483.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.62k | £112.33k | N/A | £213.02k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £18.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS FORMED FOR THE BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES IN AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND BEING PRIMARILY WITHIN THE EAST MIDLANDS. ITS OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY: THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING AND MANAGING HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION, AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT FROM TIME TO TIME BY A REGISTERED SOCIETY WHICH IS ALSO REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD WITH THE REGULATOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EVOLVE HOUSING ASSOCIATION
Unit 13
Lenton Business Centre
Lenton Boulevard
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 2BY
- Phone:
- 07976293577
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window