KETTLETHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 512648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide maintained accommodation for local groups such as play group,womens institute, private functions, parish council meetings and church functions

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,735
Total expenditure: £4,520

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 January 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN WALTER STRAW Chair
None on record
SHARON WILCOX Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.01k £11.11k £2.52k £2.65k £2.74k
Total expenditure £2.19k £1.62k £3.09k £5.25k £4.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BEECH HOUSE
BRAMPTON
LINCOLN
LN1 2EG
Phone:
07813564319
Website:

No information available