ASHINGDON AND ROCHFORD U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ashingdon & Rochford U3a is a self-help organisation for people no longer in full time employment, who live in the Ashingdon & Rochford area. Affiliated to the Third Age Trust, members pay an annual membership fee and are able to enjoy educational, creative, leisure and sporting activities, attend a monthly meeting with a guest speaker, an inhouse newsletter and a U3A magazine "U3A Matters".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 06 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Foster | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HINE | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HINE | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Paternoster | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Hill | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hill | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Stenson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noreen Bishop | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kelly | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Foster | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Collins | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Joan Cain | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROL COLLINS | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Diane Edwards | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Joan Horrex | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.05k | £4.39k | £10.27k | £20.93k | £21.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.10k | £2.32k | £9.02k | £21.19k | £20.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coombes Farm
Stambridge Road
ROCHFORD
Essex
SS4 1ES
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Email:
- carolcollinscco@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window