Financial history HOPE CITY FURNITURE

Charity number: 1181097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.68k £29.00k £39.21k £10.14k £15.69k
Total expenditure £32.65k £13.33k £22.61k £11.95k £13.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A