HOPE CITY FURNITURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the purpose of providing good quality furniture free of charge to those who have been rehoused due to crisis and who find themselves in the position of having to furnish a new home from scratch without the means to do so; promoting the recycling and re-use of furniture; and promoting social inclusion for those who are socially marginalised.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 10 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CHARLES HUTCHINSON | Chair | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kuldip Rai Dass | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Johnstone | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN GRACE HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JAN ST GEORGE JOHNSTONE | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.68k | £29.00k | £39.21k | £10.14k | £15.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.65k | £13.33k | £22.61k | £11.95k | £13.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Dec 2018 as amended on 14 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICLUAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. (3) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE REUSE AND RECYCLING OF FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS. (4) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hope City Furniture
Barn 4, Highfields Farm
Heage Lane
Etwall
DERBY
DE65 6LS
- Phone:
- 07340244416
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window