Financial history REFUGEE EDUCATION FOR EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES

Charity number: 1182800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/12/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £753 £4.37k £16.58k £18.56k £13.52k
Total expenditure £390 £792 £12.09k £15.47k £11.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A