VASCULITIS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vasculitis UK tries to support people in the UK with any of the 21 different types. They do this through providing information both online, social media and written text. By providing research grants to try to find a cure or better treatment for sufferers. By supporting carers and families and help them to understand the condition. By being advocates with the medical professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 October 2018: CIO registration
- 28 December 2023: Funds received from 1019983 THE UK VASCULITIS TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Tolliday | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Roger Collins Hart | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antony George Hart | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Dawn Wright | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Jeanette Shonfield | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Edwards | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Joanne Pollard | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Anthony Rutherford | Trustee | 22 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS D. IRELAND | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £742.61k | £196.30k | £223.28k | £239.96k | £226.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.58k | £96.81k | £162.23k | £189.23k | £220.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £741.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £79.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £855 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £20.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE IN RELATION TO VASCULITIS DISEASES, INCLUDING BY: A. SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF ALL TYPES OF VASCULITIS DISEASES; AND B. INCREASING GENERAL AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF VASCULITIS DISEASES AMONGST MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS AND THE PUBLIC; AND (II) THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM VASCULITIS DISEASES, THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, INCLUDING BY: A. PROVIDING SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ADVOCACY ; AND B. REPRESENTING SUCH PERSONS ON NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL BODIES. C. TO FORGE LINKS AND ASSOCIATIONS WITH SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS AS MAY BE BENEFICIAL TO THE AIMS OF THE CHARITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MHA
Victoria Court
17-21 Ashford Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 5DA
- Phone:
- 03003650075
- Email:
- Zoi@vasculitis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window