THE GREEK CHURCH OF THE ANNUNCIATION, MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious , social and educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Salford City
Governance
- 09 April 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL MALLOURIS | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SOTERIS YIASOUMIS | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARALAMBOS CHARIDEMOU | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE KATSOURIS | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PANTELIDES | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SOFRONIOS YIAKOUMI | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.87k | £49.55k | £90.59k | £85.21k | £90.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.68k | £69.22k | £81.43k | £90.29k | £99.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.41k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOV 1993 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE GREEK ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY OF MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Dorrian Mews
BOLTON
BL1 5BW
- Phone:
- 01617922694
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window