HENDY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hendy Foundation provides grants to local charities in the areas in which Hendy Group Ltd operate, namely Devon, Dorset, Wiltshire, Hampshire, West and East Sussex, Surrey and Kent. We do not support national charities or religious or political activities. Money donated must be spent within the names counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA LYNNE HENDY | Chair | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Weatherston | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Drew | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Marlow | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTHONY BUSBY | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.26k | £27.57k | £56.29k | £87.08k | £107.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.62k | £35.15k | £52.98k | £98.83k | £68.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2018 as amended on 25 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF DONATIONS AND GRANTS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES OPERATING WITHIN ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR SURROUNDING AREA IN WHICH THE HENDY GROUP LIMITED (COMPANY REGISTRATION NUMBER 192872) OR ANY SUCCESSOR TO THE HENDY GROUP LIMITED IS LOCATED ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"). PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE HENDY FOUNDATION SHALL NOT SUPPORT POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS CHARITIES OR CHARITIES THAT WORK OUTSIDE OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hendy Group Ltd
School Lane
Chandler's Ford
EASTLEIGH
SO53 4DG
- Phone:
- 07918671883
- Website:
-
WWW.HENDYFOUNDATION.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window