JOYCE FRIEND BREAST CANCER CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Equipment and Support for Breast Cancer Hospitals, Hospices and Charities in the UK through collection of funds from charitable donations and sale of effects of the late Mrs Friend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOF FRIEND | Chair | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liliana Victoria Salih Miller | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Salih Miller | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £430 | £110 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £1.03k | £325 | £275 | £324 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 June 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 June 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 340 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CANCER PATIENTS AT CARE INSTITUTIONS IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY HOSPITALS, HOSPICES AND SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS FOR PATIENT CARE BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT OR OF MATERIAL GIFTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
D I A Systems
Dayton House
Bolney Avenue
PEACEHAVEN
BN10 8HF
- Phone:
- 01273582241
- Email:
- admin@diasystems.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window