Trustees PETERSFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1179587
Up to date (33 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH MOSS | Chair | 17 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jamie McDougall | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Choi | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noel Thomson | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Park | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Gilbey | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Jolly | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE REDSTONE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOSEPH ORGAN | Trustee | 17 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.