NORTHCHURCH COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate the Northchurch Social Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 29 October 2018: CIO registration
- 11 May 2019: Funds received from 236409 THE NORTHCHURCH AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Austin | Chair | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Parmjit Moyo | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Larkins | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PAYNE | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY BARKER | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.76k | £30.34k | £114.68k | £121.93k | £55.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.06k | £30.28k | £27.51k | £52.42k | £69.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.42k | £11.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2018 as amended on 19 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE RESIDENTS IN NORTHCHURCH AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ASSOCIATING PUBLIC AUTHORITIES CONCERNED, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, OTHER PARTIES AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO FURTHER HEALTH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION, AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT, AND TO FOSTER A COMMUNITY SPIRIT FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE AND OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS. 2) TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE AND DEVELOP THE COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "CENTRE") OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY, AUTHORITIES OR OTHER PARTIES IN THE COMMUNITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE, FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHCHURCH SOCIAL CENTRE
BELL LANE
NORTHCHURCH
BERKHAMSTED
HP4 3RD
- Phone:
- 01442 863243
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window