THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FIREFIGHTERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports a range of good causes with a connection to firefighting and the consequences of fire, such as the rehabilitation of burns victims and injured firefighters, as well as other charitable causes supported by the Lord Mayor of the City of London from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 September 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 February 2019: CIO registration
- 30 March 2021: Funds received from 1000562 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FIREFIGHTERS CHARITABLE ...
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON GERALD ROUTH-JONES | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Colin Robert Wells | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Alick Brookes | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Maltby | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Theobald | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|||||
John Mansfield | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Fall | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Isaacs | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Holt | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Sanders BSc | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Crowder | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LIVETT BEM | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/09/2020 | 29/09/2021 | 29/09/2022 | 29/09/2023 | 29/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.52k | £19.31k | £19.18k | £18.13k | £21.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.67k | £10.54k | £47.67k | £466 | £53.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 September 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 September 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 September 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 27 FEB 2019 AMENDED ON 06 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN FIRE SAFETY MATTERS AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF TOWARD SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES OR PRIZES FOR PEOPLE INVOLVED WITH OR ASSOCIATED WITH FIREFIGHTING RESCUE OR FIRE SAFETY WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES WOULD BENEFIT FROM THE SCHOLARSHIP B) TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT A MUSEUM AND/OR ACCEPT GIFTS OR LOANS OF EQUIPMENT AND ARTEFACTS C) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worshipful Company Of Firefighters
Coopers Hall
13 Devonshire Square
LONDON
EC2M 4TH
- Phone:
- 02076001666
- Email:
- clerk@wcoff.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window