Financial history MANCHESTER TEACHING AND RESEARCH FOR RARE DISEASE GROUP ( MANTRRA)

Charity number: 1180101
Charity reporting is up to date (55 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £16.38k £7.00k £3.55k £0 £0
Total expenditure £9.44k £0 £0 £312 £882
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A