KORA BORA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KORA BORA a not-for-profit organisation that exists to inspire, encourage, and achieve positive social change by improving quality of life for underprivileged children throughout the MENA region. We use the unique global power of football to transcend social barriers, unite cultures and raise awareness, by developing programs in the fields of education, health and environmental awareness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Egypt
- Jordan
- Kuwait
Governance
- 24 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDULRAZAQ H M Y BUHIJJI | Chair | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL BIGGS | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HUSAIN ALMASAD | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS OF THE BENEFITS OF GOOD NUTRITION AND PHYSICAL EXERCISE; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND DELIVERY OF AN EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMME TEACHING LIFE SKILLS; AND (3) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; IN ALL CASES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM UNDERPRIVILEGED COMMUNITIES IN THE MENA REGION. IN THE CONTEXT OF THESE OBJECTS: "MENA REGION" MEANS COUNTRIES IN THE MIDDLE EAST AND NORTH AFRICA. "LIFE SKILLS" MEANS TEACHING RESPONSIBILITY, AUTONOMY, COMMUNICATION, LEADERSHIP AND TEAMWORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4 Benwell Studios
11-13 Benwell Rd
N7 7BL
- Phone:
- 0096525647116
- Email:
- info@korabora.ngo
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window