NEW EARSWICK NATURE RESERVE

Charity Number: 1180502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our organisation manages the New Earswick Nature Reserve ensuring it continues to be conserved, Protected and improved for the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,238
Total expenditure: £11,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL STEWART WIDD Chair 25 July 2018
None on record
Gregory James Watson Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Stephen Michael Harper Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
MALCOLM LAWRENCE SMITH Trustee 25 July 2018
None on record
IAN PETER NICHOLSON Trustee 25 July 2018
None on record
MAURICE JENKINSON Trustee 25 July 2018
None on record
CHRIS ADAMS Trustee 25 July 2018
None on record
MIKE LONGHURST Trustee 25 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.18k £10.26k £16.59k £17.57k £18.24k
Total expenditure £9.53k £7.72k £9.64k £9.81k £11.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 MALLORY CLOSE
NEW EARSWICK
YORK
YO32 4DL
Phone:
01904762622