KHANYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of socially and economically disadvantaged children and young people in Southern Africa by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities to enable them to undertake training in skills and trades education as a preparation for entry to any occupation, trade or profession or for self employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 16 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN CLIVE LUSMORE | Chair | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leon William Ford | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Hall | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Anglin | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Edward Fryer | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Christina Kate Thomas | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRENDAN GERARD BAXTER | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.71k | £5.05k | £9.04k | £7.65k | £7.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.69k | £7.10k | £4.21k | £5.38k | £6.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jan 2019 as amended on 26 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
To advance the education of socially and economically disadvantaged children and young people in Southern Africa by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities to enable them to undertake training in skills and trades education as a preparation for entry to any occupation, trade or profession or for self-employment.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Strawberry Lane
Carshalton
SM5 2NG
- Phone:
- 07840776893
- Email:
- secretary@khanya.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window