LITTLE RASCALS PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing quality childcare at affordable prices to enhance the development and education of children under statutory school age in a safe and stimulating environment. We aim to offer a child centred environment to meet the social, physical, intellectual, creative and emotional needs of each child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £134,190 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Merthyr Tydfil
Governance
- 03 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Hughes | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Kellar | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
karen roberts | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.15k | £182.23k | £174.59k | £245.78k | £225.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.22k | £141.84k | £198.00k | £234.40k | £260.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £48.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £114.57k | £16.02k | £11.38k | £134.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 May 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 May 2022 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITABLE COMPANY IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PRE-SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CWM GOLAU ICC
DUFFRYN ROAD
PENTREBACH
MERTHYR TUDFUL
CF48 4BJ
- Phone:
- 07760227106
- Website:
-
Little Rascals Preschool
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window