ONE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One Voice Choir operates in the Weymouth and surrounding areas, rehearsing 38 weeks per year and giving 4 or more public performances each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 August 2018: Standard registration
- ONE VOICE WEYMOUTH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debra Jane Shaw | Chair | 25 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Robert Hardy Blanchard | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Clare Blanchard | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CATHERINE EVANS | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HUW DAVID LLEWELLYN | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOSEPH HOPKINS | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARA LOUISE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TWIDALE ELLIS | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.93k | £382 | £5.59k | £7.40k | £8.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £397 | £5.53k | £7.11k | £7.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 SOUTH ROAD
WEYMOUTH
DT4 9NR
- Phone:
- 01305783282
- Email:
- info@onevoiceweymouth.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window