THE SEA CHANGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is a world where the emotional and psychological needs of children and young people can be met through early interventions in the local community. We will provide young parents/carers and their children or infants, and young adults, with the best psychotherapeutic support whatever their financial means, background or status.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £169,661 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Turner | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Andrews | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Alexander | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dyson | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SHAW | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.59k | £68.92k | £30.61k | £81.85k | £286.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £23.86k | £73.72k | £79.03k | £142.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.75k | N/A | N/A | £169.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS OR CARERS IN SHROPSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES THROUGH, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC SERVICES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PARENTS, CARERS AND PROFESSIONALS RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, WHO ARE IN NEED OF PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC SERVICES, BY THE PROVISION OF SPECIALIST TRAINING IN RELATED SUBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SEA CHANGE TRUST
8&9 VICTORIA MEWS
ST. AUSTINS FRIARS
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1RY
SY1 1RY
- Phone:
- 01743248886
- Email:
- info@theseachangetrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window