Financial history A COMMON WORD AMONG THE YOUTH

Charity Number: 1183542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.91k £11.33k £93.43k £124.17k £0
Total expenditure £44.62k £19.75k £72.57k £116.97k £22.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A