Financial history BLACK MOUNTAINS COLLEGE PROJECT

Charity number: 1180681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £274.35k £216.65k £458.57k £601.10k £479.52k
Total expenditure £257.64k £164.55k £446.38k £583.58k £567.74k
Income from government contracts £49.04k N/A N/A £81.25k £27.50k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £60.24k £81.25k £6.27k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £9.80k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £198.17k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £471 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £392.67k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £583.58k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A