STAG LANE SCHOOLS PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stag Lane Schools PTFA raises funds through various school events to fundraise for the school. All events take place on the school premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Harrow
Governance
- 28 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KULSOOM MUJAHID | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HINAL VARSANI | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MENKA HIRANI | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAJANA KABARIA | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STAG LANE MIDDLE SCHOOL
COLLIER DRIVE
EDGWARE
HA8 5RU
- Phone:
- 02089522731
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window