Financial history DURHAM & CLEVELAND SQUASH RACKETS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1179922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £15.63k £3.78k £2.88k £7.74k £11.02k
Total expenditure £15.55k £1.97k £3.93k £9.00k £12.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A