Trustees ASHINAGA ASSOCIATION IN THE UK

Charity number: 1183750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Saul Jonathan Benjamin Tendler Chair 05 October 2022
None on record
Alex Wagikuyu Trustee 04 March 2025
None on record
Professor Osamu Murata Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Pablo Federico Perez Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Nashina Asaria Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record
Kimeshan Naidoo Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Jordan McFarlane Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Professor 'Funmi Olonisakin Trustee 27 August 2020
None on record
NORIKO CARPENTIER-TOMINAGA Trustee 22 February 2017
None on record
YOSHIOMI TAMAI Trustee 22 February 2017
None on record
YUKIE SEKI Trustee 22 February 2017
None on record