THE JORJA-ROSE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dedicated to raising awareness for childhood brain tumours The Jorja-Rose Foundation was established after the death of Jorja-Rose from pineoblastoma brain tumour aged just 2years 10 months. The lack of awareness for this devastating disease is forefront of our goals whilst also supporting families at Queens Medical Center Nottingham. We engage various in fundraising activities within Nottingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARLA ANN DAWSON | Chair | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARIE BLAIR | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE MARIE HOLECZA | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE YVONNE GILBERT | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
LEE DAWSON | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.31k | £6.91k | £1.72k | £600 | £2.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £1.28k | £3.28k | £2.92k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
1 THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 18, THEIR FAMILIES AND SUPPORT STAFF, BEING TREATED IN NOTTINGHAM, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD COUNTIES AND WHERE PRACTICABLE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM GENERALLY, WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE SUFFERING FROM ALL TYPES OF CHILDHOOD CANCER BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES WHICH CREATE EVERLASTING GOOD MEMORIES BY ANY MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT 2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND SERVICES FOR BEREAVED FAMILIES WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LOSS DUE TO CHILDHOOD BRAIN TUMOUR 3 ADVANCING EDUCATION AMONG MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS, CARERS, FAMILIES AND THE CHILDREN WHO ARE OR WHO WERE SUFFERING OR RECOVERING FROM BRAIN TUMOURS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES THINK APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Ridgeway Walk
Top Valley
Nottingham
NG5 9DP
- Phone:
- 07525410023
- Website:
-
thejorjarosefoundation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window