COVENTRY SOMALI MUSLIM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Coventry City
- Somalia
Governance
- 12 November 2018: Standard registration
- 18 March 2022: Funds received from 1134765 COVENTRY SOMALI MUSLIM COMMUNITY TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADEN OMER | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
abdinajib hasan | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
HASSAN ABDIRAHMAN MOHAMED | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDULAHI GURRE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDIFATAH MOHAMED ELMI | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ISSE MOHAMUD ABDI | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BASHE NUR | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
YUSUF NUUR | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM HURUN | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.51k | £41.18k | £46.29k | £57.00k | £37.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.40k | £25.59k | £29.84k | £37.12k | £32.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP, CONGREGATIONAL PRAYERS, SEMINARS, SERMONS, TALKS AND CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE AFFECTED BY POVERTY, FAMINE AND DISASTERS IN, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SOMALIA AND WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID TAWFIQ
116 BROAD STREET
COVENTRY
CV6 5BG
- Phone:
- 02476665073
- Email:
- masjidtawfiq@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window