Trustees STURTON BY STOW VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 512689

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Taylor | Chair | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Rowe | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Russell | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Hallett | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Victor Moore | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Adams | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ann Page | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS STABLE | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Mary Davey | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Alison Dudley | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Newth | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Leggott | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE FORD COURTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN FREDERICK CRUST | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.