WOKING YOUTH THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the arts in the Borough of Woking and the surrounding area for children and young people age 14-21 years, in particular the art of drama by; (a) The organisation and production of weekly drama workshops, and (b) The production of a musical, a straight play and drama festival entries each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 January 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE THOMAS HAZELTON | Chair | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stewart John Mison | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Richard Knight | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.57k | £1.51k | £2.83k | £15.57k | £23.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.72k | £1.40k | £3.82k | £20.44k | £22.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 May 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jan 2019 as amended on 19 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS IN THE BOROUGH OF WOKING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGE 14-21 YEARS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF DRAMA BY; (A) THE ORGANISATION AND PRODUCTION OF WEEKLY DRAMA WORKSHOPS, AND (B) THE PRODUCTION OF A MUSICAL, A STRAIGHT PLAY AND DRAMA FESTIVAL ENTRIES EACH YEAR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Rosebery Crescent
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 9BL
- Phone:
- 01483720020
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window