VENKATAKRUSHNA VRUNDAVANA UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY - ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND SUPPORTING A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR FOLLOWERS OF THE HINDU FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR THE DVAITA PHILOSOPHY AND ADVANCING AND TEACHING THE RELIGIOUS TENETS, DOCTRINES, OBSERVATIONS CULTURE ASSOCIATED WITH THE HINDU FAITH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KESHAV THUKARAM | Chair | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUBRAMANYA RAMACHANDRA BALA | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|||||
PRASANNA VENKTESHA ARCHARYA MANIYOOR GOVINDA | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUDHIR LAXMAN SHETTY | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
YOGEENDRA BHAT ULI | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
His Holiness SRI SUGUNENDRA THEERTHA SWAMIJI | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.21k | £20.79k | £50.32k | £146.29k | £218.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.58k | £18.23k | £46.30k | £41.94k | £95.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 September 2022 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 September 2022 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 July 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 August 2020 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: 2.1.1. ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND SUPPORTING A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP FOR FOLLOWERS OF THE HINDU FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR THE DVAITA PHILOSOPHY. 2.1.2. ADVANCING AND TEACHING THE RELIGIOUS TENETS, DOCTRINES, OBSERVATIONS AND CULTURE ASSOCIATED WITH THE HINDU FAITH, IN PARTICULAR AND DVAITA PHILOSOPHY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 & 3
Beaconsfield Road
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 3RD
- Phone:
- 07949504394
- Email:
- venkatavrunda@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window