Financial history THE RAAIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £278.23k £23.40k £5 £883 £32.43k
Total expenditure £83.04k £112.73k £31.58k £7.62k £9.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A