THE EMMA COSGROVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Emma Cosgrove Foundation provides relief for teenagers and young people suffering from cancer themselves or distressed by having a family member or friend with cancer by the provision of support, assistance or positive experiences to aid relief.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 20 July 2024

Total income: £7,949
Total expenditure: £4,488

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Lancashire
  • Manchester City
  • Rochdale
  • Stockport
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY WILDE Trustee 31 July 2018
None on record
CHLOE RIGNEY Trustee 31 July 2018
None on record
CHERYL ANN WILDE Trustee 31 July 2018
None on record
DANNIELLE JAMIE MAISNER Trustee 31 July 2018
None on record
PHILIP STEVEN RIGNEY Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/07/2020 20/07/2021 20/07/2022 20/07/2023 20/07/2024
Total gross income £2.66k £3.99k £9.20k £15.44k £7.95k
Total expenditure £1.35k £2.68k £2.36k £6.81k £4.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 July 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2024 20 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 July 2023 20 March 2025 304 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2023 20 March 2025 304 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 July 2022 07 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2022 07 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 July 2021 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2021 20 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 July 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 July 2020 15 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
56 Tarvin Road
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 2LL
Phone:
07752271544
Website:

emmacosgrovefoundation.org