LIVING SPRING CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is new testament church established to preach 'Word of GOD' as contained in the holy bible to people in the North West of England and to support the communities on humanitarian ground in pursuit of selfless services to less privileged persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 28 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev OLUWAFUNMILAYO OKOME | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADETEJU KOYEJO | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
OYEDELE JENROLA | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABIMBOLA OLAWUYI | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAPO KOYEJO | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £1.88k | £2.22k | £4.33k | £5.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £1.24k | £1.18k | £1.78k | £3.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 IVY STREET
MANCHESTER
M40 9LN
- Phone:
- 07888636773
- Email:
- lucky.okome@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window