THE KINGFISHER FUNERALS COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance such charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees see fit in St Neots, Huntingdon and St Ives and any other place(s) where Kingfisher Funerals may operate in the future, by providing grants and awards to local organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW HICKSON | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT HARDIMAN | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE NICOLA CHARLTON | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JUGGINS | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE INGLIS | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.09k | £5.01k | £22 | £41 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.82k | £1.99k | £637 | £1.55k | £1.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT IN ST NEOTS, HUNTINGDON AND ST IVES AND ANY OTHER PLACE(S) WHERE KINGFISHER FUNERALS MAY OPERATE IN THE FUTURE, BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO LOCAL ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGFISHER FUNERALS
GATE LODGE
CEMETERY ROAD
ST NEOTS
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
PE19 2BX
- Phone:
- 01480471001
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window