DISABILITY ADVICE NORTH EAST SUFFOLK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A free, impartial and confidential service giving information and advice to people of all ages and with all disabilities or health problems, in the area of North East Suffolk. The main office is in Lowestoft, but qualified advisers also undertake outreach in rural areas and home visits when necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £52,679 from 2 government contract(s) and £21,797 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 September 2018: CIO registration
- 02 May 2019: Funds received from 296844 D.I.A.L. LOWESTOFT AND WAVENEY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Ann Oldham | Chair | 24 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Andrew David Pearce | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Sampson | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Warner | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Tiffen | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Brierley | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GWENDOLINE JOYCE PARSONS | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.78k | £174.65k | £155.81k | £148.87k | £209.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.09k | £160.27k | £159.42k | £155.28k | £197.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.68k | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.71k | £64.51k | £54.14k | £38.03k | £21.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Sep 2018 as amended on 12 Dec 2020 as amended on 14 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES LIVING IN LOWESTOFT, WAVENEY, NORTH SUFFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA SO THAT THEY MAY LEAD ACTIVE AND FULFILLING LIVES INTEGRATED IN SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
161 ROTTERDAM ROAD
LOWESTOFT
SUFFOLK
NR32 2EZ
- Phone:
- 01502511333
- Email:
- info@danesonline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window