Trustees HADLEIGH CASTLE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1179413

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN JOHN SMYTH | Chair | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Phylllis Easter | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Soule | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Martin | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Valerie Hyde | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Galley | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Frances Martin | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Middleton | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL GONDA | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BURLS | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUNE MARGARET MORGAN | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAT TYLER | Trustee | 07 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
GILL WILSON | Trustee | 07 June 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.