MORETONHAMPSTEAD SWIMMING POOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The running of an outdoor heated swimming pool for the benefit of the community of Moretonhampstead, it's neighbouring parishes and visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 04 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Nicholas Fishwick | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Judith Mary Denman | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
TONI DEVILLE | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
KERRY ANNE CHAPPELL PHD | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MARY-ANNE CHRISTINE COURSE | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Miles Swinburne Thompson | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
ALAN RAYMOND COOPER | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 April 2023 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 July 2022 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 April 2023 | 628 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2022 | 727 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 April 2023 | 993 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION THROUGH THE CONSTRUCTION,MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND RUNNING OF A SWIMMING POOL IN THE TOWN OF MORETONHAMPSTEAD IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN IN PARTICULAR AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL.
Area of benefit
IN THE TOWN OF MORETONHAMPSTEAD IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
11A Cross Street
Moretonhampstead
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 8NL
- Phone:
- 07768 262448
- Email:
- moretonpool@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window