COMMUNITY EDUCATION DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 1982: Standard registration
- 26 April 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- C E D C (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.70m | £47.56k | £268 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76m | £124.13k | £167 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 28 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 28 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY PROMOTING THE IDENTIFICATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF GOOD PRACTICES IN COMMUNITY EDUCATION AND BY CONDUCTING RESEARCH INTO COMMUNITY EDUCATION. PLEASE SEE DEED FOR FURTHER DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window