THE STELLA MCCARTNEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Stella McCartney Cares Foundation runs a give away program for post-mastectomy bras. The bras are distributed through hospitals in the UK and through the foundation's website to women in need globally. Additionally, the foundation support education, research and awareness raising on environmental issues as they relate to fashion's impact on the planet.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 11 October 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STELLA NINA MCCARTNEY | Chair | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bergkamp | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
HELEN NEWMAN | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.67k | £62.68k | £21.84k | £428.31k | £9.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.02k | £159.92k | £46.22k | £16.37k | £9.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 February 2024 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 December 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
1. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE FOUNDATION ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FASHION INDUSTRY BY: (I) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (II) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY REGARDING THE FASHION INDUSTRY, AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; (C) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (AND, IN PARTICULAR, PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES) IN THE CAUSES, EFFECTS AND PREVENTION OF BREAST CANCER AND BREAST DISORDERS AND THE RELIEF AND TREATMENT OF THOSE SUFFERING OR RECOVERING FROM BREAST CANCER AND BREAST DISORDERS; AND (D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. IN PARAGRAPHS (A) AND (B) ABOVE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 OLAF STREET
LONDON
W11 4BE
- Phone:
- 02078982729
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window