THE ORTHODOX CHURCH OF ST CUTHBERT AND ST BEDE, DURHAM

Charity Number: 1181914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN GENERAL AND THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF A PARISH IN THE CITY OF DURHAM

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £97,136
Total expenditure: £68,256

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CUTHBERT AND ST BEDE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Justin-Alexandru Mihoc Chair 30 August 2018
None on record
Dr Carmen Hubbard Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Emanuel Ionutescu Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Dr Patrick Gray Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Dr Sarah Amanda Kelly Trustee 30 August 2018
None on record
Dr Irina Sokolova-Snegir Trustee 30 August 2018
None on record
Professor ANDREW LOUTH Trustee 30 August 2018
THE FELLOWSHIP OF ST ALBAN AND ST SERGIUS
Received: On time
DARLINGTON MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE CENTRE FOR MARIAN STUDIES
Received: On time
THE ORTHODOX ASSOCIATION OF THEOLOGICAL SCHOOLS (OATS)
Received: On time
THE METROPOLITAN KALLISTOS FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.29k £108.24k £39.58k £65.89k £97.14k
Total expenditure £6.76k £1.95k £3.64k £132.23k £68.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 WANLESS TERRACE
DURHAM
DH1 1RU
Phone:
07775561463