ST MARY'S CONTACT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The facilitation of contact between minor children and non-resident parents and other relatives as sessions held by the charity on alternate Saturdays at Norwich Central Baptist Church, Duke Street, Norwich.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 17 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Bouttell | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eunice Walcott | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Rae Severson | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Duffy | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID EASTON | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY MURIEL HORBURY | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.56k | £10.06k | £8.88k | £544 | £14.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.79k | £4.32k | £6.05k | £7.48k | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.63k | N/A | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 August 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 August 2024 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2023 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2023 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SEPARATED FROM PARENTS AND / OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS THROUGH DIVORCE AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN IN NORWICH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN NORFOLK BY THE PROVISION OF" FOLLOWED BY PROVIDING A SAFE, FRIENDLY AND NEUTRAL ENVIRONMENT WHERE CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES CAN SPEND TIME WITH THEIR NON-RESIDENTIAL PARENTS AND SOMETIMES OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Chestnut Hill
Eaton
NORWICH
Norfolk
NR4 6NL
- Phone:
- 01603760497
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window