21st Wyre Forest (Franche) Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising events have included district led events such as Bag-packing, Christmas post, and the annual Pledge Plod. Social events have included the summer barbeque and carol service. Youngsters have enjoyed numerous activities at the HQ, at Rhydd Covert and on various trips to productions and events over the last year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £440 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 June 1982: Standard registration
- KD21 (Working name)
- KD21 AIR SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 21ST KIDDERMINSTER (BRINTON PARK) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 21st WYRE FOREST (BRINTON PARK) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- KIDDERMINSTER AIR SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicky Duffield | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hall | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Ford | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE SHARPE | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GREENFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK GRAHAM SEARL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE SEARL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.45k | £22.12k | £25.46k | £24.90k | £20.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.64k | £13.72k | £17.57k | £26.14k | £33.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £700 | £19.43k | £10.67k | £3.25k | £440 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912 And Royal Charter granted on 22 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Montana
Stanklyn Lane
Summerfield
KIDDERMINSTER
Worcestershire
DY10 4HS
- Phone:
- 07876 030452
- Email:
- stephaniesearl@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window